Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cole, Edwin, Cole, Vicki, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by James D. Eggleston, Jr., against Barnett Gathering, Lp, Xto Energy, Inc., Xto Resources I Gp, Llc, represented by David E. Chamberlain, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon M. Chrestman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | JY (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | RULE 166 PRETRIAL (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 588141 Vol./Book 588141 |
|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery | |
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.