Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jerry R. Hoodenpyle, against Younger Ranch Llc, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 513128 Vol./Book 513128 |
|
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation YOUNGER RANCH LLC Served 02/03/2009 | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | File | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.