Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against B2Squared Llc, B3Squared Llc, Hendrixson, Robert A., Hendrixson, Wetonna, Industrial Wood Products, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by James D. Bradbury, Victor C. Serafino, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment B2SQUARED LLC Unserved | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | AOJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.