Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jerry R. Hoodenpyle, against Holden, Wendi Carol, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 658648 Vol./Book 658648 |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation HOLDEN, WENDI CAROL Served 01/21/2009 | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.