Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adamo, John, Adamo, Lori, Canright, Renee, Williams, Barbara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Scott B Frenkel, against Ellis, William Ryan, Varel Gp Llc, Varel Gp Newco Llc, Varel International Inc, Varel International Ind. L.P., (total of 6) See All represented by Jerry L. Ewing, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2008 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 562743 Vol./Book 562743 |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.