Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Hubble, Teresa Gail, Crouch, William Corey, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2008 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 520222 Vol./Book 520222 |
|
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.