Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Mccaffrey, Larry Murrell, Hampton, Sherri Jane, Granados, Maxie, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2008 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Information | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Adjudication Of Nonparentage | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
June 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 535733 Vol./Book 535733 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.