Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clark, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Richard C. Dalton, against Texas Motors Ford Co., Inc., Ford Motor Company, represented by James E. Phillips, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 570537 Vol./Book 570537 |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery | |
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation TEXAS MOTORS FORD CO., INC. Returned Unserved 12/23/2008 Returned 12/23/2008 | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation FORD MOTOR COMPANY Served 12/09/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.