Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jerry R. Hoodenpyle, against Cortes, Gregorio, represented by J. Douglas Cortes, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 573817 Vol./Book 573817 |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Order Signed | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Tax Citation CORTES, GREGORIO Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.