Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Massie, Pearline Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Massie, Charles Michael, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
April 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | PROVE UP (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Information | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book 515858 Vol./Book 515858 |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Withholding Order Vol./Book 515859 Vol./Book 515859 |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Intervention |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.