Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Service District #06, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Whitsitt, Michele A, Whitsitt, Hal, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Sheriff'S Return On Tax Sale | |
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Information | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 633227 Vol./Book 633227 |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.