Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Service District #06, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Gillis, James R, Financial Management & Associates Inc, represented by Gary Westenhover, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Sheriff'S Return On Tax Sale | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.