Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Service District #06, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Pugh, John C, Daniel, W.R., represented by Gary Westenhover, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Sheriff'S Return On Tax Sale Vol./Book 939484 Vol./Book 939484 |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 939487 Vol./Book 939487 |
|
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.