Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cronk, Lawrence W, Cronk, Joan L, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Richard C. Dalton, against Chrysler, Llc, represented by Matthew R. Beatty, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 590630 Vol./Book 590630 |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 531114 Vol./Book 531114 |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.