Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jerry R. Hoodenpyle, against Westbrook, Michael, Westbrook, Catherine, represented by Patton E. Maynard, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 510482, Page 510482 Vol./Book 510482, Page 510482 |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation WESTBROOK, CATHERINE Served 12/09/2008 | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation WESTBROOK, MICHAEL Served 12/09/2008 | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.