Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Vela, Robert, Chane, Lauren Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 209, Page 358 Vol./Book 209, Page 358 |
|
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation CHANE, LAUREN BROOKE Served 01/07/2008 | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation VELA, ROBERT Unserved | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.