Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrizo Oil & Gas, Inc., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Richard R. Scimeca, against Mueller, Fred, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Removed by Party | |
September 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 197, Page 479-480 Vol./Book 197, Page 479-480 |
|
September 07, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
September 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation MUELLER, FRED Served 02/13/2007 | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation MUELLER, FRED Returned Unserved 01/04/2007 Returned 01/04/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.