Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jerry R. Hoodenpyle, against Robinson, David, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Dismissed | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 12, Page 431 Vol./Book 12, Page 431 |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
November 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
November 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation ROBINSON, DAVID Served 02/07/2007 | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.