Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farmer, Jennifer Kathleen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Farmer, Benjamin Shea, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.