Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brendetta Anthony Scott, against Barton, Lance J., Barton, Linda K., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Dismissed | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 193, Page 235-236 Vol./Book 193, Page 235-236 |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.