Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Don Schnebly, against Hull, Melody Renee, Hopkins, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Cases Relating To Criminal Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 211, Page 141-142 Vol./Book 211, Page 141-142 |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice HULL, MELODY RENEE Unserved | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation HOPKINS, MICHAEL Served 12/22/2006 | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.