Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gentry, Kelly Jolene, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Gentry, Jerry Lane, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Withholding Order Vol./Book 191, Page 164-167 Vol./Book 191, Page 164-167 |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Information | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 190, Page 309-324 Vol./Book 190, Page 309-324 |
|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.