Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Melvin Thathiah, against Johnson, Don Z., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 201, Page 433 Vol./Book 201, Page 433 |
|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation JOHNSON, DON Z. Returned Unserved 04/25/2007 Returned 04/25/2007 | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.