Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyes, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anh H. Regent, against Runyon, Charles Herman, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 196, Page 486-487 Vol./Book 196, Page 486-487 |
|
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation RUNYON, CHARLES HERMAN Served 01/11/2007 | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.