Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Springtown Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Services District #01, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Servicing, Green Tree, Pointer, Richard W., Brown, James D Et Al, Brown, April E., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 11, Page 211-212 Vol./Book 11, Page 211-212 |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation SERVICING, GREEN TREE Returned Unserved 05/11/2007 Returned 05/11/2007 | |
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
April 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | File |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.