Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyes, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anh H. Regent, against Thuy, Do T, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 606631 Vol./Book 606631 |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation THUY, DO T Served 04/02/2008 | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation THUY, DO T Unserved | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.