Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cmc Mechanical, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zan Moltz, against Ratcliff Constructors, Lp, Continental Casualty Company, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Fiat | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion For New Trial Civil | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 501447, Page 501447 Vol./Book 501447, Page 501447 |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.