Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Independent School District, Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Bryant, John H., Bryant, Barbara A, Baca, Peria, represented by William K Clary, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 542668 Vol./Book 542668 |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation BRYANT, BARBARA A Served 05/15/2009 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation BRYANT, JOHN H. (LIENHOLDER) Served 05/06/2009 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.