Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Wynn, Joe A, Toth, Eileen M, Roy, Eileen, Martin, Robert Lee, Enchanated Lakes Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Gary Westenhover, Charles E. Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 752458 Vol./Book 752458 |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Tax Citation TOTH, EILEEN M Served 03/16/2010 Returned 03/16/2010 | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Tax Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.