Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allison, Trey J., filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Clark, Melissa Marrie, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig Towson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Case Disposed CANCELED Dismissal Docket (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Case Disposed |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (Fee) | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY ORDERS (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.