Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anh H. Regent, against Abdelhamed, Mohammad, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 620253 Vol./Book 620253 |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation ABDELHAMED, MOHAMMAD Unserved | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | File | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.