Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barnett, Bart, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Densmore, Jessica Helen, represented by Scott Henderson, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2006 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 208, Page 107 Vol./Book 208, Page 107 |
|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
November 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.