Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Powell, Tanya Raye, Powell, Seldon James, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Powell, Tanya Raye, Medina, Richard L., Ii, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Jerry Buckner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2002 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 12, Page 126-127 Vol./Book 12, Page 126-127 |
|
May 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Buckner, Jerry) | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation POWELL, TANYA RAYE Served 06/26/2006 | |
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation MEDINA, RICHARD L., II Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.