Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Sean E. Cook, against Gonzalez, Billy Joe, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
November 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ | |
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ | |
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Information | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | File | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion To Enforce Family |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.