Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Kimberly Criado Krieger, against Barnes, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 202, Page 160-167 Vol./Book 202, Page 160-167 |
|
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Information | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 200, Page 86-106 Vol./Book 200, Page 86-106 |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 200, Page 107-108 Vol./Book 200, Page 107-108 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.