Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by William E Kuykendall, against Nelson, Gregory Stephen, Mcneely, Dianne, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Transfer | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Change Of Venue Transfer | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 325, Page 08-09 Vol./Book 325, Page 08-09 |
|
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation NELSON, GREGORY STEPHEN Served 01/24/2007 | |
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation MCNEELY, DIANNE Served 01/24/2007 | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | File | |
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.