Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by William E Kuykendall, against Weger, Patricia Ann, Arsenault, Daniel Everett, represented by Charles L. Bradford, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2006 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 340, Page 344-347 Vol./Book 340, Page 344-347 |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation ARSENAULT, DANIEL EVERETT Served 10/03/2007 | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation WEGER, PATRICIA ANN Served 10/11/2007 | |
September 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 324, Page 01-06 Vol./Book 324, Page 01-06 |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 324, Page 07-08 Vol./Book 324, Page 07-08 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.