Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Junior College, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Flinn, Richard, represented by Kathleen Flinn Wise, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2002 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Motion Granted | |
January 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Other | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 7, Page 27-28 Vol./Book 7, Page 27-28 |
|
October 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.