Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hume, Steven, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Garner, Stephen E., against Garza, Jesus Zaragosa, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 1999 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Release Of Judgment | |
April 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORD PERMITTING PYMNT O JUDGMENT BY INSTALLMENTS/I |
|
April 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF INSTALLMENT AGREEMENT ON JUDGMENT |
|
July 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER PERMITTING PAY OF JDGMNT BY INSTALLMENTS 43/252-253 |
|
June 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F APPROVAL O INSTALLEMNT AGRMNT O JGMT/GG |
|
December 04, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERT. OF NO APPEAL: STEVEN HUME Issue Date: 12/04/2000 |
|
March 13, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: STEVEN HUME Issue Date: 03/13/2000 |
|
February 21, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR REQ AJ/JG |
|
February 21, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JG |
|
January 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT CV 0022 P 0681-0683 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.