Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Huerta, Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuerta, Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EOW/TERM/MLD/INTERTEK: MELISSA L. WRZESNIEWSKI Issue Date: 06/19/2008 |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EMP. ORDER OF WITHOLDING: MELISSA L. WRZESNIEWSKI Issue Date: 06/16/2008 |
|
September 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC /GG |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EOW/MLD/INTERTEK CALEB: EDMUND J. WRZESNIEWSKI, III Issue Date: 09/06/2006 |
|
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EMP. ORDER OF WITHOLDING: EDMUND J. WRZESNIEWSKI, III Issue Date: 09/01/2006 |
|
July 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EOW/MLD/CALEB BRETT USA: MELISSA L. WRZESNIEWSKI Issue Date: 07/11/2005 |
|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv EMP. ORDER OF WITHOLDING: MELISSA L. WRZESNIEWSKI Issue Date: 06/17/2005 |
|
June 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) E/O/W ERNGS. FOR CHLD. SUPT. (SCANNED) |
|
April 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO MODIFY CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
April 18, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Event to Reopen Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.