Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gracier, Samantha, filed a(n) Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) case against Scott, Randi, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2009 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time29 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order: Restraining Order After Hearing 214240-Order: Permanent Rest. Order Motion/OSC Detail: 211255 - Harassment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: PERMANENT REST. ORDER [214240] Motion: HARASSMENT [211255] Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Gracier, S. vs. Scott, R. Motion OSC Details: 211255 - Harassment ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 23 2009 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request 229110-Request Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST [229110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration 213310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION [213310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order: Temporary Restraining Order 214230-Order: Temporary Rest. Order Motion/OSC Detail: 211255 - Harassment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: TEMPORARY REST. ORDER [214230] Motion: HARASSMENT [211255] Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exparte Application 212430-Hearing: Exparte; Gracier, S. vs. Scott, R. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.