Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
George, Adams, Adams, George, Sr., filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Shank, Daniel F., Budd, Russell W, against Asten Grp, Inc, Certainteed Corp, Flintkote Co, Us Mineral Products Co, 3M, (total of 42) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 1999 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MTN T DISMISS/GG |
|
August 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC TO W/H INCOME FOR C/S |
|
June 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC/GG |
|
January 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O BNCY |
|
December 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD GRNTED NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES CO. MTN TO SUBST |
|
December 19, 2000 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) COUNSEL OF RECORD 99/346-347 |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv TESTMNY O DAVID STEVEN EGILMAN MD/GG |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv O SETTLEMNTS/GG |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES CO AMD ANS/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.