Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Monica, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Henry, Thomas J, against Diamond Shamrock Refining & Marketing Co, Ultramar Diamond Shamrock Inc, represented by Abernethy, William, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Bennett, Max presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBennett, Max Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 1998 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
February 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BILL AFDVIT C/R F HUMPAL PHYS THERAPY/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BILL REC AFDVIT C/R F ADVANCED CLINIC/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT C/R F EMERGENCY SVC GROUP/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT C/R F RADIOLOGY ASSOC LLP/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MED REC AFDVIT C/R F ADVANCED CLINIC/GG |
|
January 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MED REC AFDVIT C/R F HUMPAL PHYS THERAPY/GG |
|
December 29, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 1ST INTEROGS/GG |
|
December 28, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT 2ND AMD RESPO T PLT REQ F DISCLOSURE/GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.