Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Bennett, Max presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 1996 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) COURTS ORDER GRANTG REQ TO UNSEAL RECORDS-SCANNED |
|
September 04, 1996 | Docket Event |
09/04/1996 Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0184 P 0973-0000 |
|
August 30, 1996 | Docket Event |
08/30/1996 Case Event Conv MTN F NONSUIT/RC |
|
May 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
05/22/1996 Case Event Conv PTNRS ANS T 1ST SET O REQ F PRODN/RC |
|
May 01, 1996 | Docket Event |
05/01/1996 Hearing (OCA) TEMP ORDS & TEMP INJ 178/885-894 |
|
April 26, 1996 | Docket Event |
04/26/1996 Case Event Conv SEM CERTF F ANGELICA VASQUEZ/RC |
|
April 22, 1996 | Docket Event |
04/22/1996 Case Event Conv RESPO REQ F PRODN O DOC/SJ |
|
April 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
04/17/1996 Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: ANGELICA VASQUEZ |
|
April 17, 1996 | Docket Event |
04/17/1996 Case Event Conv STATMNT CONCERN ALT DISP RES/RC |
|
April 05, 1996 | Docket Event |
04/05/1996 Case Event Conv APPLN F TEMP ORD & INTERIM ATTY FEES/VWF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.