Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Juarez, Jesus, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bonilla, William D, against Mid Century Ins Co, represented by Green, Bob, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Villarreal, Joaquin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVillarreal, Joaquin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 1992 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS (I) |
|
March 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MTN & ODRT TO WTHDRW & RE-INVEST FUNDS 225/435 |
|
March 11, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN & ORD T WITHDRAW & RE-INVEST FUNDS/AG |
|
June 01, 1993 | Docket Event |
06/01/1993 Case Event Conv LTR DATED 4-19-93 WITH COPY OF CITIZEN'S STATE BANK STATEMENT/B |
|
February 19, 1993 | Docket Event |
02/19/1993 Case Event Conv ATTY CORRESPONDENCE RE: $1,500 CK F AD LITEM FEES/LP |
|
February 17, 1993 | Docket Event |
02/17/1993 Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY CV 0047 P 0700-0704 |
|
December 30, 1992 | Docket Event |
12/30/1992 Hearing (OCA) ORD APPTG GUARDIAN AD LITEM ATTY FRANK GARZA 46/663 |
|
December 21, 1992 | Docket Event | 12/21/1992 Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 21, 1992 | Docket Event |
12/21/1992 Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 21, 1992 | Docket Event |
12/21/1992 Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: MID CENTURY INS. CO. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.