Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Carlos filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 1991 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Administrative Writ of Withholding (AG) | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT ORD /GG |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JDGMNT NTC |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/NTC OF ADMIN-ROBSTOWN UTILITY SYSTEMS |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 01/23/2008 |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) CSRO-CNFRMTN O ARRS/I |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 09/25/2007 |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 08/06/2007 |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 07/13/2007 |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/NTC OF ADMIN-CITY OF ROBSTOWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.