Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas Com Bnk, Cc, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Duncan, Scott J., against Simnacher, Faroy, Ross, Don, Energy Unltd, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Bennett, Max presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 1984 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER REVIVING JUDGMENT (SCANNED) |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AMD ANS O DFT DON ROSS T MTN F SCIRE FACIAS T REVIEW JGMT /GG |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T JUDGE TOM GREENWELL |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM AUBYN K SHETTLE JR |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR SCIRE FACIAS TO REVIVE JUDGMENT/JJM - . |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC OF ASSIGNMENTO JUDGMENT & APPEARANCE O COUNSEL/JJM |
|
June 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ASSIGNMENT O JGMT & JGMT LIEN /GG |
|
January 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
01/18/1996 Citation EXECUTION (PU): ENERGY UNLTD., INC. SERVED: 01/30/96 FILED: 02/14/96 Issue Date: 01/18/1996 File Date: 02/14/1996 Service Date: 01/30/1996 |
|
January 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
01/18/1996 Case Event Conv EXECUTION (PU): ENERGY UNLTD., INC. SERVED: 01/30/96 FILED: 02/14/96 Issue Date: 01/18/1996 File Date: 02/14/1996 Service Date: 01/30/1996 |
|
January 18, 1996 | Docket Event |
01/18/1996 Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0051 P 321-321 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.