Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Ford, Joshua W., against Masecampo, Emily, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Woolsey, Jo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoolsey, Jo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed Plaintiff's Nottice of Filing Business Records Affidavit |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed ...Agreed |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) [JP] | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.