Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Conn Appliances, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Amin, Allen I., against Lopez, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Benavides, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenavides, Joe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment NISI | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | File Sent to Records Warehouse | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice mailed hearing notice |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filed Certificates of last known address, N:on Military, Affidavit, Motion Default Judgment |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Alternative Service Granted |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) [JP] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.