Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kettler, John, against Spence, James, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Benavides, Joe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenavides, Joe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2020 |
CategoryDebt Claim |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | File Sent to Records Warehouse | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice hearing notice mail returned to sender |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice mailed hearing notice |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion default judgment |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Alternative Service Granted. |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.